Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Naselli, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1786BornNapoli
23 Dec 180923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Jun 185064.0SelectedBishop of Noto, Italy
17 Feb 185164.6ConfirmedBishop of Noto, Italy
21 Apr 185164.8Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
26 May 185366.9SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
27 Jun 185367.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
3 May 187083.9DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Naselli:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Naselli C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 410, and Page 438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013