Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Francesco Cardinal Orioli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1778Born
6 May 179314.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Sep 183253.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Apr 183354.3AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
1 May 183354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
12 Feb 183859.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Feb 183859.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
18 Dec 184163.0ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
2 May 184768.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
5 May 184869.4AppointedSecretary of State
Jun 1848³69.4ResignedSecretary of State
30 Sep 185071.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
20 Feb 185273.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Francesco Orioli (VIAF: 89228373)
Antonio Francesco Cardinal Orioli O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Prefect of Bishops and Regulars

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnacavallo, Archdiocese of Pesaro, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Feb 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 16
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast