Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ricci

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1791Born
14 Aug 181423.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 184755.9AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Jun 184756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
26 May 187785.9DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ricci
Bishop Luigi Ricci (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCupi les Visco
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast