Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Jona

Deceased

Bishop of Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1811Born
20 Sep 183423.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 185443.4AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
9 Jul 185443.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
30 Nov 186352.8DiedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Jona
Bishop Luigi Jona (born , died ) Bishop of Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrevi Abbadia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017