Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Antonio Cardinal de Lorenzana y Butrón

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1722BornLeón
175128.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 176542.7AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
11 Aug 176542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Apr 176643.6AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
22 Aug 176643.9InstalledArchbishop of México, Federal District
27 Jan 177148.3AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Mar 178966.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jul 179774.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
15 Dec 180078.2RetiredArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
14 Apr 180481.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio de Lorenzana y Butrón:
Cardinal Francisco Antonio de Lorenzana y Butrón (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toledo

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
  • a cardinal for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 82, Number 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013