Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio de los Tueros

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1724BornTrucíos
19 Dec 179167.5AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
12 Feb 179267.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
22 Sep 179773.3DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio de los Tueros:
Archbishop Juan Antonio de los Tueros (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 110, Number 572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013