Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Pérez Santa María

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1718BornAvila
13 Jun 176143.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
13 Jun 176143.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
6 Sep 176143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
15 Jul 179577.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Pérez Santa María:
Bishop Felipe Pérez Santa María (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 180, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016