Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Nadal Crespí

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1746Born
12 Sep 179448.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
16 Nov 179448.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Dec 181872.6DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Nadal Crespí
Bishop Bernardo Nadal Crespí (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoller

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 112, Number 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018