Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanasio Puyal y Poveda

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1751BornAlpera
21 Jun 179039.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Jun 179039.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
8 Aug 179039.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
19 Aug 181463.2SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
26 Sep 181463.3ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Oct 182776.4DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Atanasio Puyal y Poveda
Bishop Atanasio Puyal y Poveda (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 108, Number 560
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016