Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Pérez Celis, O.S. Cam. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1753Born
19 Aug 181460.6SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
26 Sep 181460.7ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
27 Dec 181460.9Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
20 Jan 182773.0DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Pérez Celis
Bishop Isidoro Pérez Celis O.S. Cam. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotes

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1814, Number 11
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018