Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Blas Joaquín Álvarez de Palma

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1754BornJerez de la Frontera
17 Apr 179844.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain
17 Apr 179844.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
17 Jun 179844.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
20 Jul 180147.4AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
20 Dec 180248.8AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
19 Dec 181460.8AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
29 Nov 183783.8DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Blas Joaquín Álvarez de Palma
Archbishop Blas Joaquín Álvarez de Palma (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 64, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103, and Page 451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 117, Number 616
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016