Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Miguel Pérez González

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1745Born
22 Apr 181973.5SelectedBishop of Gerona, Spain
4 Jun 181973.6ConfirmedBishop of Gerona, Spain
10 Oct 181974.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
7 Dec 182479.2DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Miguel Pérez González
Bishop Juan Miguel Pérez González (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaluenga del Rosario

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,416
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 139, Number 747
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018