Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Sáenz Santamaría

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1726Born
24 Jul 179771.5AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
15 Oct 179771.7Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
14 Jan 181386.9DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Sáenz Santamaría
Bishop José Antonio Sáenz Santamaría (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuro de Cameros

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,654
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 116, Number 607
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast