Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Agapito Ramírez Arellano

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1738Born
28 Aug 179860.0AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
11 Nov 179860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Dec 181072.3DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Agapito Ramírez Arellano
Bishop Juan Agapito Ramírez Arellano (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuente la Reina

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 118, Number 623
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018