Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Cuerda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1747Born
29 Mar 179042.9AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
11 Jul 179043.2Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
28 May 179548.1ResignedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1815²67.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Cuerda
Bishop Francisco de Cuerda (born , died 1815) Bishop Emeritus of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMora, Spain

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,887
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 108, Number 563
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,790, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast