Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Álvarez Cortés

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1734Born
3 Dec 179258.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
1793²58.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 Sep 179560.9AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
1 Feb 180166.2DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Álvarez Cortés
Bishop Miguel Álvarez Cortés (born , died ) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotril, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 111, Number 579
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018