Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cartagena

Archidioecesis Carthaginensis in Columbia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 June 1900
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 8,000 (3,090 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Casa Arzobispal, Carrera del Arzobispado 5 N. 34-55, Apartado aereo 400, Cartagena, Colombia
  • Telephone: (5)664.53.08
  • Fax: 664.49.74

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cartagena
24 April 1534ErectedDiocese of Panamá Diocese of Cartagena (erected)
31 August 1804Territory LostDiocese of Cartagena
Diocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Antioquía (erected)
Archdiocese of Cartagena
20 June 1900ElevatedDiocese of Cartagena Archdiocese of Cartagena
20 June 1912Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena Mission "Sui Iuris" of San Andrés y Providencia (erected)
1924Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena Prefecture Apostolic of Sinú (erected)
7 July 1932Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena Diocese of Barranquilla (erected)
20 November 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena
Vicariate Apostolic of San Jorge
Diocese of Montería (erected)
25 April 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena Diocese of Magangué (erected)
25 April 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena Diocese of Sincelejo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cartagena
1950804,000805,00099.9%35437810,3076838274ap1951
1959590,000593,00099.5%4626728,1944239354ap1960
1964814,703815,17899.9%4121725841,3951721,048398ap1967
1970530,000550,00096.4%3535707,5714930640ap1971
1976660,000680,00097.1%5835937,09634833980ap1977
1980780,000832,00093.8%6336997,87834637682ap1981
1990950,0001,150,00082.6%5542979,79325830874ap1991
19991,249,0001,400,00089.2%77491269,91226326194ap2000
20001,350,0001,505,00089.7%745212610,71426226194ap2001
20011,051,0001,167,00090.1%83441278,275254261100ap2002
20021,066,0001,185,00090.0%82461288,328256261108ap2003
20031,176,0001,196,00098.3%77531309,046259246103ap2004
20041,076,5001,210,00089.0%81541357,974279243103ap2005
20061,076,0001,228,00087.6%77581357,970291258102ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014