Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Aguado y Chacón

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1696³BornGranada, Spain
175457.3AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Feb 175558.4AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
1756²59.3Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
18 Jul 176265.8AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
27 Mar 176467.5DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Aguado y Chacón:
Bishop Jacinto Aguado y Chacón (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 322
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013