Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lima

Archidioecesis Limanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 12 February 1546
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 639 (246 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadodelima.org/
  • Mailing Address: Plaza de Armas s/n, Apartado 1512, Lima 100, Peru
  • Telephone: (01) 427-5980
  • Fax: 427-1967

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lima
14 May 1541ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Lima (erected)
8 January 1546Territory LostDiocese of Lima Diocese of Quito (erected)
Archdiocese of Lima
12 February 1546ElevatedDiocese of Lima Archdiocese of Lima
27 June 1561Territory LostDiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Santiago de Chile (erected)
15 April 1577Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Arequipa (erected)
15 April 1577Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Trujillo (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
17 March 1865Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Huánuco (erected)
15 May 1899Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Huaraz (erected)
10 August 1946Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Ica (erected)
12 April 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Territorial Prelature of Yauyos (erected)
15 May 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Huacho (erected)
14 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Carabayllo (erected)
14 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Chosica (erected)
14 December 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Lima Diocese of Lurín (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lima
1950842,0001,031,00081.7%1313314621,8224691,33194ap1951
19662,037,1202,122,00096.0%1485837312,7869221,920117ap1967
19702,460,3792,523,46697.5%1626558173,0119332,435121ap1971
19763,459,9123,594,77596.2%2006518514,06579872,194131ap1977
19804,306,5004,500,00095.7%1896458345,163231,0232,215135ap1981
19905,396,0005,638,00095.7%1557148696,209431,1332,271148ap1991
19992,880,7203,200,80090.0%1665657313,940131,3101,280112ap2000
20002,260,8012,457,39392.0%1365657013,225138651,480112ap2001
20012,260,8012,457,39392.0%1462854315,24558561,295112ap2002
20023,164,2463,425,25092.4%1394786175,12841,0731,388112ap2003
20032,804,1663,155,74088.9%1404706104,59641,2131,443113ap2004
20042,852,2573,169,17590.0%1434706134,65241,1461,755113ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 28 Oct 2014