Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Gutiérrez y Ceballos

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1682²BornPuenteriego, Spain
26 Jul 173048.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
12 Feb 173149.1ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
6 Jul 173250.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
7 Sep 174058.6SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
14 Nov 174058.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
10 Sep 174260.6InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
16 Jan 174563.0DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Gutiérrez y Ceballos:
Archbishop José Antonio Gutiérrez y Ceballos (born 1682, died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261, and Page 420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015