Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Camargo Angulo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1663BornAgreda
5 Oct 171653.3AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
18 Dec 171653.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
20 Mar 172561.7ResignedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 May 1773109.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Camargo Angulo:
Bishop Juan Camargo Angulo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 56.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 34, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 22 Oct 2013