Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Barnuevo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1663Born
24 Jul 173067.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
17 Sep 173067.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
25 Jul 173572.3DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Barnuevo
Bishop José Barnuevo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDeza

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 48, Number 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,730, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast