Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Magdaleno

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1685BornValladolid
15 Dec 172843.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Segovia, Spain
15 Dec 172843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
1 May 172944.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
24 Sep 174257.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
17 Jan 175065.0DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Magdaleno:
Bishop José Francisco Magdaleno (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014