Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Núñez Monteagudo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1695³BornVillamalea
23 Feb 173943.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
23 Feb 173943.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
10 May 173943.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
11 Jul 176165.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Andrés Núñez Monteagudo:
Bishop Andrés Núñez Monteagudo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 357
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 57, Number 258
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014