Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Abadiano

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1678BornSegovia, Spain
2 Oct 170022.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173860.3SelectedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
19 Dec 173860.5ConfirmedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
28 Jun 173961.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 May 174768.9DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan García Abadiano:
Bishop Juan García Abadiano (born , died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 58, Number 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015