Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Archidioecesis Caracensis o S. Iacobi in Venezuela



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 27 November 1803
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 790 (305 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdecaracas.com/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 954, Monjas a Gradillas, Plaza Bolivar, Caracas 1010-A, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0212)542.16.11; 542.17.55
  • Fax: 542.02.97

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Coro
21 June 1531ErectedDiocese of Coro (erected)
Diocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
20 June 1637Name ChangedDiocese of Coro Diocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
27 November 1803ElevatedDiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
7 March 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Diocese of Mérida
Diocese of Calabozo (erected)
12 October 1922Territory LostArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela Diocese of Valencia en Venezuela (erected)
21 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo
Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Diocese of Maracay (erected)
23 July 1965Territory LostArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela Diocese of Los Teques (erected)
15 April 1970Territory LostArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela Diocese of La Guaira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
1950740,515755,00098.1%1071462532,92633155862ap1951
19591,334,4611,538,29086.7%1423224642,8755661,26196ap1960
19661,741,6081,777,15298.0%1653775423,2135801,85083ap1967
19702,290,7932,290,793100.0%2974407373,1086171,65093ap1971
19762,200,0002,500,00088.0%1606007602,89497571,50092ap1977
19802,473,0002,839,00087.1%1325196513,798107121,45396ap1981
19903,073,0003,573,00086.0%1315006314,870118382,401117ap1991
19992,724,6923,205,52085.0%1035006034,518147431,200121ap2000
20003,700,0005,000,00074.0%1202824029,20311523725110ap2001
20013,700,0005,000,00074.0%11824536310,19211523725110ap2002
20023,700,0005,000,00074.0%11924536410,16411523725110ap2003
20034,579,0006,189,17074.0%12024536512,545134761,198105ap2004
20043,400,0004,000,00085.0%1304806105,573117441,198116ap2005
20063,528,0004,150,00085.0%1404195596,311137301,332111ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014