Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan López de Agurto de la Mata

Deceased

Bishop of Coro, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1572³Born
20 Jul 163057.5SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
10 Feb 163158.1ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
8 Aug 163461.6SelectedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
20 Nov 163461.9ConfirmedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
24 Dec 163765.0DiedBishop of Coro, Venezuela

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan López de Agurto de la Mata
Bishop Juan López de Agurto de la Mata (born , died ) Bishop of Coro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Laguna, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363, and Page 286
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 154, Number 975
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,631, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast