Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Narciso Coll y Prat

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1754BornCornellá de Torri, Spain
6 Mar 178429.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 180752.7SelectedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
11 Jan 180853.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
11 Jun 181055.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
25 Feb 182267.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Palencia, Spain
19 Apr 182267.3ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
30 Dec 182268.0DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Narciso Coll y Prat:
Archbishop Narciso Coll y Prat (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 296, and Page 391
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015