Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Felipe Rodríguez Delgado

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1848Born
1873¹24.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 188537.1AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
13 Dec 188537.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
13 Dec 188739.5DiedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Felipe Rodríguez Delgado
Bishop Manuel Felipe Rodríguez Delgado (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChacao, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 14.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017