Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis-Auguste Affre

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1793Born
16 May 181824.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 183946.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Apr 184046.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
27 Apr 184046.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
4 Jun 184046.6SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
13 Jul 184046.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
6 Aug 184046.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Paris, France
27 Jun 184854.7DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Denis-Auguste Affre (VIAF: 73902775)
Archbishop Denis-Auguste Affre (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Rome-de-Tarn

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88, and Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 25
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,025, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast