Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Marie-Edmont Blanquart de Bailleul

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1795BornCalais
12 Jun 182428.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 183237.0SelectedBishop of Versailles, France
17 Dec 183237.3ConfirmedBishop of Versailles, France
27 Jan 183337.4Ordained BishopBishop of Versailles, France
5 Mar 184448.5SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
17 Jun 184448.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
1 Aug 184448.9InstalledArchbishop of Rouen, France
12 Mar 185862.5ResignedArchbishop of Rouen, France
30 Dec 186873.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie-Edmont Blanquart de Bailleul:
Archbishop Louis-Marie-Edmont Blanquart de Bailleul (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 326, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013