Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Simon-Louis-Marie de Dreux-Brézé

Deceased

Bishop of Moulins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1811BornBrézé
25 Mar 183422.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 184938.4SelectedBishop of Moulins, France
7 Jan 185038.5ConfirmedBishop of Moulins, France
14 Apr 185038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
30 Apr 185038.9InstalledBishop of Moulins, France
5 Jan 189381.5DiedBishop of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Simon-Louis-Marie de Dreux-Brézé (VIAF: 122088328)
Bishop Pierre-Simon-Louis-Marie de Dreux-Brézé (born , died ) Bishop of Moulins

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016