Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles)

Archidioecesis Aquensis in Gallia (-Arelatensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Christophe Dufour, Archbishop
  • Claude Feidt, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 31 December 2007
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Marseille
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 4,580 (1,769 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Provence-Méditerranée
  • Official Web Site: http://aixarles.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 7 Cours de la Trinite, CS 70782, 13625 Aix-en-Provence CEDEX 01, France
  • Telephone: 4.42.17.58.00
  • Fax: 4.42.17.59.93

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Aix
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Aix (erected)
Archdiocese of Aix
5th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Aix Archdiocese of Aix
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Arles (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Fréjus (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Marseille (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Riez (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Toulon (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Aix Diocese of Marseille
Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)
6 October 1822Name ChangedArchdiocese of Aix Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)
6 October 1822Territory AddedArchdiocese of Arles (suppressed) Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun) (no longer a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles)
31 December 2007Name ChangedArchdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun) Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles) (removed Embrun as secondary title)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)
1948258,000288,00089.6%184302141,20541572130ap1951
1959280,000315,00088.9%211352461,13869530131ap1960
1969479,272.0%2216428501104548101ap1971
1980474,500601,00079.0%202852871,6531109567124ap1981
1990592,000735,00080.5%178642422,446696520124ap1991
1999637,000793,38380.3%157562132,9901070364128ap2000
2000668,000832,60080.2%151602113,16510119360128ap2001
2001688,000857,07180.3%163582213,1131479360112ap2002
2002688,000857,07180.3%143592023,4051476360122ap2003
2003688,000857,07180.3%142391813,8011356360122ap2004
2004688,000857,07180.3%153351883,6591350354122ap2005
2006688,000857,07180.3%143361793,8431456334120ap2007
Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles)
2012714,000867,00082.4%131281594,4902157265120ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013