Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques de Concoz, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1318AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
9 Apr 1318Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
9 Jul 1322AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
1 May 1329DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Concoz
Archbishop Jacques de Concoz O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310, and Page 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,827

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast