Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Avignon

Archidioecesis Avenionensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 9 February 2009
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Marseille
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 3,578 (1,382 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Provence-Méditerranée
  • Official Web Site: http://diocese-avignon.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 31 rue Paul Manivet, B.P. 40050, 84005 Avignon, CEDEX 01, France
  • Telephone: 4.90.27.26.00
  • Fax: 4.90.27.07.58

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Avignon
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Avignon (erected)
Archdiocese of Avignon
21 November 1475ElevatedDiocese of Avignon Archdiocese of Avignon
Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801ElevatedArchdiocese of Avignon Diocese of Avignon (Metropolitan to Diocese)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Alès (Alais) (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Mende
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Apt (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Digne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Carpentras (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Cavaillon (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Nîmes (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Orange (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Valence
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Uzés (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Vaison (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Avignon Diocese of Fréjus
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Avignon Diocese of Nîmes
Archdiocese of Avignon
6 October 1822ElevatedDiocese of Avignon Archdiocese of Avignon
Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)
6 August 1877Name ChangedArchdiocese of Avignon Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison) (no longer a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Avignon
9 February 2009Name ChangedArchdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison) Archdiocese of Avignon (Secondary Titles Lost)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)
1950200,000249,83880.1%1595020995645700176ap1951
1959262,000268,31897.6%179422211,18556650176ap1960
1970340,000353,96696.1%174572311,47176484175ap1971
1980334,000395,40084.5%176512271,471179492175ap1981
1990406,000463,70087.6%148932411,6847151349178ap1991
1999350,000475,81973.6%125471722,0341790300178ap2000
2000350,000500,13870.0%122441662,1081986278178ap2001
2001350,000498,52370.2%120421622,1601979270178ap2002
2002350,000498,52370.2%122421642,1341978257178ap2003
2003350,000498,52370.2%122421642,1342084249178ap2004
2004350,000498,52370.2%120621821,92318105237178ap2005
2006350,500500,00070.1%124621861,88424103229178ap2007
Archdiocese of Avignon
2012405,100554,00073.1%123631862,1772797174179ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014