Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre de Montecatini, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1632BornRoma
13 May 168653.7AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
26 May 168653.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
17 Nov 168654.2InstalledArchbishop of Avignon, France
6 Oct 168957.1DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Montecatini:
Archbishop Alexandre de Montecatini O. Cart. (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015