Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Aldobrandini

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1571BornRome
17 Sep 159322.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Nov 159322.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
20 Dec 159928.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
14 Jun 160433.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
13 Sep 160433.4AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
17 Oct 160433.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
1 Jun 160534.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
4 Jun 161241.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
31 Aug 162049.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
10 Feb 162149.8DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Aldobrandini:
Pietro Cardinal Aldobrandini (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1593
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015