Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Erminio Cardinal Valenti

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564BornTrevi
9 Jun 160440.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 160440.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
3 Aug 160541.6AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
18 Sep 160541.7Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
22 Aug 161854.6DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Erminio Valenti:
Cardinal Erminio Valenti (died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013