Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement VIII

Ippolito Aldobrandini (Sr.)

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1536Born
1580²43.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 158549.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
18 Dec 158549.8Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 158650.3AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
30 Jan 159255.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Feb 159255.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Feb 159255.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Mar 160569.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Aldobrandini (Sr.) (VIAF: 88910241)
Pope Ippolito Aldobrandini (Sr.) (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano, Diocese of Fano
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Paoline Chapel, Saint Mary Major, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 25.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1585
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018