Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franz Seraph Cardinal von Dietrichstein

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1570Born
1597²26.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 159928.5Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159928.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
1 Sep 159929.0AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
8 Sep 159929.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
27 Sep 162353.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
23 Nov 163666.2DiedArchbishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Seraph von Dietrichstein (VIAF: 51804507)
Franz Seraph Cardinal von Dietrichstein (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSanta Maria degli Angeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBrünn (Brno), Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Olomouc, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
  • a cardinal for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • c34: AT, 25 Feb 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017