Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Maria Cardinal Pallotta

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1594Born
8 Jun 162430.3AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
6 Jun 162632.3ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
9 Sep 162834.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
18 Sep 162834.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
Oct 1628³34.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 162834.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
19 Nov 162935.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 May 163036.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
26 May 163137.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
23 Sep 165258.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
21 Apr 165965.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
21 Nov 166167.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
2 Jul 166369.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
11 Oct 166672.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
22 Jan 166873.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Maria Pallotta (VIAF: 89102284)
Giovanni Battista Maria Cardinal Pallotta (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldarola, Diocese of Camerino, Italy, Italy
Ordained PriestMikulov, Diocese of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
Ordained BishopLeopoldstag, Chapel, Vienna, Diocese of Wien, Austria
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santo Spirito in Sassia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santa Caterina in Caldarola, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
  • a cardinal for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 335
  • op/ob/c12: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,004
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 32
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017