Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Morra

Deceased

Bishop of Isola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1608Born
2 Jun 164738.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 164738.8AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
7 Jul 164738.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
Oct 1648³40.0DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Morra (VIAF: 89278304)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Morra (born , died Oct 1648) Bishop of Isola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 1.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 12
  • ob: AT, 10 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017