Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

Dioecesis Melphiensis-Rapollensis-Venusina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ciro Fanelli, Bishop
  • Gianfranco Todisco, P.O.C.R., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Melfi
11th CenturyErectedDiocese of Melfi (erected)
Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
16 May 1528UnitedDiocese of Melfi
Diocese of Rapolla
Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
21 August 1976Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Melfi e Rapolla (from Immediately Subject)
8 September 1976Territory AddedArchdiocese of Conza-Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi-Bisaccia (Pescopagano) Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
8 September 1976Territory AddedDiocese of Muro Lucano (Rapone, Ruvo dei Monte, and San Fei) Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
8 September 1976Territory LostDiocese of Melfi e Rapolla (Immaculate Conception B. M. V. (in Inforchia)) Archdiocese of Potenza e Marsico Nuovo
Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Melfi e Rapolla
Diocese of Venosa
Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
188639,192.0%93013OTC
195050,38051,00098.8%362381,32526214ap1951
197049,00049,35099.3%278351,40087017ap1971
198046,70055,22084.6%288361,29786524ap1981
Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa
199082,00091,00090.1%4315581,41331910632ap1991
199990,16090,68099.4%4710571,58181210132ap2000
200090,14090,60099.5%4410541,66991210032ap2001
200190,00091,00098.9%4311541,66611129632ap2002
200289,00090,90097.9%4610561,58910129832ap2003
200389,00090,16898.7%4710571,56110117332ap2004
200489,00090,00098.9%4611571,56110117332ap2005
201389,20089,60099.6%3712491,8209124934ap2014
201681,00087,00093.1%3313461,7608134833ap2017
201980,58086,57093.1%346402,014864433ap2020
202179,62585,54093.1%368441,8099104232ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Melfi
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 335
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 189
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 896
  • Diocese of Melfi e Rapolla
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 238
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 264, and Page 265
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 593, and Page 594
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 675, to Page 677
  • Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 738, to Page 740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 27 Jun 2023