Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Ruffino

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Oct 1544AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
21 Mar 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
7 Feb 1547AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
1557¹DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Ruffino
Bishop Marino Ruffino (died 1557) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241, and Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast