Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

Archidioecesis Tranensis-Barolensis-Vigiliensis (-Nazarensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Battista Pichierri, Archbishop
  • Carmelo Cassati, M.S.C., Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trani
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Trani (erected)
Archdiocese of Trani
11th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Trani Archdiocese of Trani
1547Territory AddedDiocese of Salpi (Salapia) (suppressed) Archdiocese of Trani
Archdiocese of Trani e Bisceglie
27 June 1818UnitedDiocese of Bisceglie
Archdiocese of Trani
Archdiocese of Trani e Bisceglie
Archdiocese of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie
22 September 1828Name ChangedArchdiocese of Trani e Bisceglie Archdiocese of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie
Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
21 April 1860Name ChangedArchdiocese of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie) Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
1950254,000254,62999.8%125471721,4763051035ap1951
1970243,080243,46599.8%102661681,4468161048ap1971
1980247,305249,84199.0%104551591,5556544655ap1981
Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)
1990264,000269,54297.9%89501391,8995443856ap1991
1999270,187282,68795.6%103441471,83865134658ap2000
2000270,934283,43495.6%104431471,843164934058ap2001
2001272,226284,72695.6%109401491,827164333558ap2002
2002272,914285,41495.6%106381441,895164032360ap2003
2003274,260286,76095.6%107371441,904163931460ap2004
2004274,060286,56095.6%104341381,985163630261ap2005
2010279,680292,20095.7%103351382,026253926564ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014