Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Seccia

Archbishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1951 Born
26 Nov 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
20 Jun 199746.0AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
8 Sep 199746.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
24 Jun 200655.0AppointedBishop of Teramo-Atri, Italy
8 Sep 200655.2InstalledBishop of Teramo-Atri, Italy
29 Sep 201766.3AppointedArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
2 Dec 201766.4InstalledArchbishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Seccia
Archbishop Michele Seccia (born ) Archbishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta, Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
Ordained BishopSan Severo, Diocese of San Severo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lecce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,046
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017
  • i: CB, 2 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast