Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Carata

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1915BornLecce
30 Jan 193822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lecce, Italy
17 May 196549.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
17 May 196549.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Praesidium
26 Jun 196550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praesidium
8 Apr 196751.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cannae
28 Aug 197156.2AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
15 Dec 199075.5RetiredArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
25 Jan 200387.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Carata:
Archbishop Giuseppe Carata (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Nov 2013