Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Ricchiuti

Bishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1948 BornBisceglie
9 Sep 197224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
27 Jul 200557.0AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
8 Oct 200557.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
15 Oct 200557.2InstalledArchbishop of Acerenza, Italy
15 Oct 201365.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
4 Jan 201465.4InstalledBishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ricchiuti:
Archbishop Giovanni Ricchiuti (born ) Bishop of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Altamura-Gravina-Acquaviva delle Fonti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,997
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Nov 2013