Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Pichierri

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1943Born
30 Aug 196724.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 199047.8AppointedBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
26 Jan 199147.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
13 Nov 199956.7AppointedArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
26 Jan 200056.9InstalledArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy
26 Jul 201774.4DiedArchbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pichierri (VIAF: 89031064)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Pichierri (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSava
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Church, Manduria, Diocese of Oria

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,538
  • d: CB, 26 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Jul 2017