Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Leuzzi

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Aemona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1955 Born
2 Jun 198428.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 201256.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
31 Jan 201256.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aemona
14 Apr 201256.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aemona

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Leuzzi (VIAF: 12614847)
Bishop Lorenzo Leuzzi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrani, Archdiocese of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)
Ordained PriestCathedral, Trani, Archdiocese of Trani-Barletta-Bisceglie (-Nazareth)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • c34: CB, 15 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017